EP1692037 - DRIVER'S CAB SUPPORTING STRUCTURE FOR A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE HAVING A SAFETY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMMANN, Rüdiger Sommerhofenstrasse 244 71067 Sindelfingen / DE | 02 /
HERZOG, Gerd In den Äuleswiesen 22 71573 Allmersbach / DE | 03 /
STECHOW, Roland Wildunger Strasse 72 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04820589.2 | 12.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004EP12832 | Priority number, date | DE2003157930 | 11.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357930 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061313 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692037 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692037 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06, B62D33/063, B62D21/15 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (KR);
B62D33/00 (KR);
B62D33/06 (EP,KR,US);
B62D33/063 (KR);
B62D33/0636 (EP,US);
B62D33/077 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRERHAUS-TRAGSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG MIT EINER SICHERHEITSZELLE | [2006/34] | English: | DRIVER'S CAB SUPPORTING STRUCTURE FOR A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE HAVING A SAFETY CELL | [2006/34] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT DE CABINE DE CONDUITE POUR UN VEHICULE UTILITAIRE POURVU D'UNE CELLULE DE SECURITE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.01.2010 | NL | 13.01.2010 | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/36] | NL | 13.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2853621 (LOUIS HEULIEZ CERIZAY SA) [X] 1,2,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 9; | [X]US6520565 (KJELLBERG STURE [SE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1164073 (ALCAN TECH & MAN AG [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0685381 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [Y] 9 * column 3, lines 21-26; figure 1 * |