EP1696190 - AUTOMATIC ICE MAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOSHIZAKI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-16, Minami Yakata, Sakae-cho Toyoake-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Kazuhiro c/o Hoshizaki Denki Kabushiki 3-16, Minamiyakata, Sakae-cho,Toyoake Aichi 470-1168 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Akihiko c/o Hoshizaki Denki Kabushiki 3-16, Minamiyakata, Sakae-cho Toyoake Aichi 470-1168 / JP | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Feldmeier, Jürgen, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Feldmeier, Jürgen, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820694.0 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004JP18530 | Priority number, date | JP20030423384 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003423384 | JP20030423385 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003423385 | [2006/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061974 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696190 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25C5/08, F25C1/22 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
F25C5/08 (EP,US);
F25C1/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | F25C1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHER EISERZEUGER | [2006/35] | English: | AUTOMATIC ICE MAKER | [2006/35] | French: | MACHINE A GLA ONS AUTOMATIQUE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2006 | Translation filed | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB917055 (SIEMENS ELECTROGENERATE AG); | [A]JPS4886139 (N.N.); | [A]DE2521863 (DKK SCHARFENSTEIN VEB); | [X]DE2510660 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2510758 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US4081914 (RAUTENBACH ROBERT, et al) [X] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3921900 (RHEINISCH-WESTFAELISCHES ELEKTRIZITAETSWERK AG, 4300 ESSEN, DE); | [A]US5408844 (STOKES VIJAY K [US]); | [A]JPH102644 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03062056 (DARTMOUTH COLLEGE [US], et al); | [A]US2003155467 (PETRENKO VICTOR [US]); | [A]JP2003242732 (FUCHIGAMI MICRO KK) | International search | [Y]JPH102644 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2003242732 (FUCHIGAMI MICRO KK) |