EP1692195 - POLYETHYLENE FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANNON, Porter, C. 1129 Carriage Court Seabrook, TX 77586 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Rakesh 22915 Rachels Manor Drive Katy, TX 77494 / US | 03 /
SHIRODKAR, Pradeep, P. 3118 Willow Wood Trail Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 04 /
EHRMAN, Fred, D. 14226 Ridgewood Lake Ct. Houston, TX 77062 / US | 05 /
DAVIS, Mark, B. 11 Richland Drive Hurricane, WV 25526 / US | 06 /
TRAPP, Keith, W. 15102 Cranbourne Drive Houston, TX 77062 / US | 07 /
DONGMING, Li 4214 Pine Brook Cove Houston, TX 77059 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04820704.7 | 31.03.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US09807 | Priority number, date | US20030527480P | 05.12.2003 Original published format: US 527480 P | US20040781404 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: US 781404 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061561 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692195 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692195 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F210/02, C08J5/18 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
B29C48/022 (KR);
B29C48/08 (KR);
C08F210/08 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2323/06 (KR);
C08J2323/08 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2666/06 (KR);
Y10T428/1334 (US);
Y10T428/1338 (US);
Y10T428/1345 (US);
Y10T428/1352 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/01, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/26 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/34] | C08F10/02, C08F210/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENFOLIEN | [2006/34] | English: | POLYETHYLENE FILMS | [2006/34] | French: | FILMS DE POLYETHYLENE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2009 | BE | 21.01.2009 | CY | 21.01.2009 | DK | 21.01.2009 | EE | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | NL | 21.01.2009 | RO | 21.01.2009 | SI | 21.01.2009 | SK | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | IE | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | LU | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | HU | 22.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
HU | 22.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 21.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4414369 (KURODA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]US5539076 (NOWLIN THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9951649 (BOREALIS POLYMERS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0116192 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 24; examples 6,7 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 9 * * claims 11-13 *; | [A]US6274684 (LOVEDAY DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 29 - column 32; examples 8-10 * | International search | [X]US4414369 (KURODA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US5539076 (NOWLIN THOMAS E [US], et al); | [X]WO9951649 (BOREALIS POLYMERS OY [FI], et al) |