EP1708742 - METHODS OF ENHANCING IMMUNE RESPONSE IN THE INTRADERMAL COMPARTMENT AND COMPOUNDS USEFUL THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPBELL, Robert 607 Phar Lap Lane Bahama, NC 27503 / US | 02 /
DOLAN, Kevin, G. 113 Volta Place Holly Springs, NC 27050 / US | 03 /
ALARCON, Jason 230 Newberry Lane Durham, NC 27703 / US | 04 /
WOODLEY, Wendy, D. 131 Drummond Place Cary, NC 27511 / US | 05 /
MIKSZTA, John 3205 Lochinvar Drive Durham, NC 27705 / US | 06 /
METHA, Sheetal 11 Sousa Court East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
CAMPBELL, Robert 607 Phar Lap Lane Bahama, NC 27503 / US | ||
02 /
DOLAN, Kevin, G. 113 Volta Place Holly Springs, NC 27050 / US | |||
03 /
ALARCON, Jason 230 Newberry Lane Durham, NC 27703 / US | |||
04 /
WOODLEY, Wendy, D. 131 Drummond Place Cary, NC 27511 / US | |||
05 /
MIKSZTA, John 3205 Lochinvar Drive Durham, NC 27705 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Weber, Thomas Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Weber, Thomas von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04821303.7 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004US41021 | Priority number, date | US20030527599P | 05.12.2003 Original published format: US 527599 P | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005074460 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1708742 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K45/00, A61K47/00, G01N33/53, A61K39/12 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/41] | A61K39/00, A61K45/00, A61K47/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER IMMUNANTWORT IM INTRADERMALEN KOMPARTIMENT UND DAFÜR NÜTZLICHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2006/41] | English: | METHODS OF ENHANCING IMMUNE RESPONSE IN THE INTRADERMAL COMPARTMENT AND COMPOUNDS USEFUL THEREOF | [2006/41] | French: | PROCEDES POUR AMELIORER LA REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE DANS UNE PARTIE INTRADERMIQUE ET COMPOSES UTILISES DANS CES PROCEDES | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0134801 (FIBROGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,36,38,41,42 * The whole document, in particular; page 21, lines 17-37; example 12 *; | [X]WO02074244 (IOMAI CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,36 * page 33, line 25 *; | [X]WO02087494 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [X] 1-5,39,41,42 * The whole document, in particular; page 22, lines 23-28; claims 1,12,18 *; | [X] - NAKAYAMA ET AL, "A clinical analysis of gelatin allergy and determination of its causal relationship to the previous administration of gelatin-containing acellular pertussis vaccine combined with diphtheria and tetanus toxoids", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY - YEARLY BOOK, INC, US, (19990201), vol. 103, no. 2, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 321 - 325, XP005687168 [X] 7 * The whole document, in particular; page 322, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70508-7 | International search | [X]US2003170818 (HALEY DANA A [US], et al); | [Y]US2003171253 (MA AVERIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2003191056 (WALKER KENNETH [US], et al); | [Y] - GENNARO A.R., Remington's Pharmaceutical Science., EASTON, PENSYLVANIA., MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY., (1990), page 1550, XP008052391 |