EP1706845 - IMPROVED CARGO HANDLING SECURITY HANDLING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION Unisys Way, MS/E8-114 Blue Bell, PA 19424-0001 / US | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TISSINGTON, A. R. 130 Valero Street, Salcado Village Makati City, Manila 1621 / PH | 02 /
CONCEPCION, Dennis E. 150 P. Rosales St., Sta. Ana Pateros, Metro Manila 1621 / PH | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Vaughan, Christopher Tammo, et al HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Vaughan, Christopher Tammo, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04821635.2 | 01.12.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004US40108 | Priority number, date | US20030725666 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: US 725666 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091743 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1706845 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q99/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0832 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL [2007/11] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FRACHTHANDHABUNGS-SICHERHEITSHANDHABUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2006/40] | English: | IMPROVED CARGO HANDLING SECURITY HANDLING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2006/40] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION AMELIOREE DE LA SECURITE DE LA MANUTENTION DES CARGAISONS | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2011 | 19.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/47] | 14.07.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0026839 (INFODREAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 12, lines 1-4 * * page 14, line 6 - page 15, line 9 *; | [X]WO03073228 (PUBLIC WAREHOUSING COMPANY KSC [KW], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - page 5, line 26 * * page 16, line 19 - page 18, line 15 * * page 24, lines 11-21 * * page 25, line 23 - page 28, line 3 * * page 28, line 26 - page 29, line 15 *; | [A] - RYNES J ET AL, Gamma-ray and neutron radiography as part of a pulsed fast neutron analysis inspection system, NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A:ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, PAGE(S) 895 - 899, (19990211), ISSN 0168-9002, XP004161959 [A] 2,12,19 * abstract * * Part 1. Introduction; pages 895-896 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(98)01039-0 | International search | [Y]US5838759 (ARMISTEAD ROBERT A [US]); | [A]US2002176531 (MCCLELLAND KEITH M [US], et al); | [A]US6526443 (GOLDSMITH STEVEN Y [US], et al); | [X]US2003069738 (CASEY LYNN ANN [US], et al); | [A]US2003115072 (MANUCHA RAJIV [CA], et al); | [Y]US2003167240 (NAPIER DEBORAH B [US], et al); | [Y]US2003175982 (SMITH GERALD [US]); | [Y]US6651054 (DE JUDICIBUS DARIO [IT]); | [YP]US6984524 (NGUYEN DAO HINH [CA], et al) |