EP1682247 - ATMOSPHERIC PLASMA TREATMENT OF MELTBLOWN FIBERS USED IN FILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lydall, Inc. One Colonial Road Manchester, CT 06042 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states LYDALL, INC. One Colonial Road, P.O. Box 151 Manchester, CT 06040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDERS, Robert, G. 7 Alder Creek Lane Rochester, NH 03867 / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 04822160.0 | 07.07.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004US21648 | Priority number, date | US20030486197 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: US 486197 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006011887 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1682247 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682247 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
D06M10/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ATMOSPHÄRISCHE PLASMABEHANDLUNG VON MELTBLOWN-FASERN, DIE BEI DER FILTRATION VERWENDET WERDEN | [2006/30] | English: | ATMOSPHERIC PLASMA TREATMENT OF MELTBLOWN FIBERS USED IN FILTRATION | [2006/30] | French: | TRAITEMENT PLASMA ATMOSPHERIQUE DE FIBRES OBTENUES PAR FUSION-SOUFFLAGE UTILISE POUR LE FILTRAGE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 29.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | IE | 07.07.2009 | LU | 07.07.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
LU | 07.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
LU | 07.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 18.02.2009 | |
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0001737 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 11 * * page 2, line 13 - line 18 * * page 5, line 17 - line 23 * * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 7 *; | [XD]US6419871 (OGALE KUMAR [US]) [XD] 1-28 * abstract ** column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 28 * | Examination | WO0001737 | WO0107144 | by applicant | USRE30782E |