EP1819637 - SYNTHESIS OF DIAMOND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Six (Production) (Pty) Ltd. Debid Road Nuffield 1559 Springs / ZA | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRÖMANN, Corina, Vera, Helga 34 Jupiter Street Atlasville 1459 Boksburg / ZA | 02 /
TSHISIKHAWE, Francis 8806 Zone 5 Pimville 1809 Soweto / ZA | 03 /
HANSEN, John, Olaf 2 Weybridge Jatinga Lane 2056 Paulshof / ZA | 04 /
BURNS, Robert, Charles 15 Los Angeles Drive 2195 Northcliff / ZA | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04822572.6 | 09.12.2004 | [2007/34] | WO2004IB04045 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061672 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819637 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1819637 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/06, B01J3/06 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
B01J3/062 (EP,US);
C01B32/26 (EP,US);
B01J2203/061 (EP,US);
B01J2203/062 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0655 (EP,US);
B01J2203/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON DIAMANT | [2007/34] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF DIAMOND | [2007/34] | French: | SYNTHESE DE DIAMANT | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | IE | 09.12.2011 | LU | 09.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 30.03.2011 | |
GR | 01.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4333986 (TSUJI KAZUO, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 35 - line 54 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 6 *; | [A]US6030595 (SUMIYA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* column 2, line 15 - line 28; example - *; | [I] - NAKA, S. ET AL, "Effect of ambient pretreatment of graphite and solvent-catalyst on diamond formation", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 22, pages 1081 - 1086, XP009050967 [I] 1-12 * "Experimental procedure", "Conclusions";; figure 1; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01103554 |