EP1835366 - AUTOMOBILE CONTROLLER, AND ITS SOFTWARE CREATING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARISAWA, Fumio HITACHI, LTD. 12th floor Marunouchi Center, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chioda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
MAYAMA, Kazunori HITACHI, LTD. 12th floor Marunouchi Center bldg 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
TSUNEDOMI, Kunihiko HITACHI, LTD. 12th floor Marunouchi Center bldg 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
NARISAWA, Fumio HITACHI, LTD. Marunouchi Center Bldg.,6-1-Marunouchi 1-chome Chioda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
MAYAMA, Kazunori HITACHI, LTD. Marunouchi Center bldg 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUNEDOMI, Kunihiko HITACHI, LTD. Marunouchi Center bldg 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04822576.7 | 07.12.2004 | [2007/38] | WO2004JP18197 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061884 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835366 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, F02D41/26, G06F9/44 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
F02D41/26 (EP,US);
G06F8/20 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25389 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | G05B19/05 | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/11] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMOBIL-REGLER UND SOFTWAREERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2007/38] | English: | AUTOMOBILE CONTROLLER, AND ITS SOFTWARE CREATING METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2007/38] | French: | CONTROLEUR D'AUTOMOBILE ET SYSTEME ET METHODE DE CREATION DE LOGICIEL | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2007 | Translation filed | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 29.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH03282935 (PFU LTD, et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract *; | [I]JPH07277105 (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1-18 * abstract *; | [I]GB2324942 (IBM [US]) [I] 1-18 * abstract ** page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 17 *; | [I]US6550052 (JOYCE MARY [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 17 * | International search | [A]JPH07277105 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2003171774 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [A]JP2004026083 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JPH05150960 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [A]JPH09128246 (FUJITSU LTD) |