EP1521122 - Control of a lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heintze, Johannes Albertina van Nassaustraat 1 5616 BC Eindhoven / NL | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05000107.2 | 08.05.2003 | [2005/14] | Priority number, date | EP20020253303 | 10.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02253303 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1521122 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, H01S3/134 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
G03F7/70041 (EP);
G03F7/70558 (EP);
H01S3/134 (EP);
H01S3/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/14] | Title | German: | Steuerung eines lithographischen Apparates | [2005/14] | English: | Control of a lithographic apparatus | [2005/14] | French: | Réglage d'un appareil lithographique | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/03] | 21.12.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2007 | 21.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03252890.3 / EP1361479 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2001244531 ; | [A]US5982790 (GROSSMAN WILLIAM MARK [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 11, line 18 - column 12, line 6 ** column 11, line 48 - line 52 *; | [XA]WO0128048 (LAMBDA PHYSIK AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 58, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 60, paragraph 2 - page 61, paragraph 2 * [A] 7 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001244531 A 20010907 (USHIO SOGO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK;NEC CORP) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * [A] 7 |