EP1598730 - System and method for supporting input confirmation in mobile terminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torii, Kuniaki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/44] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
Torii, Kuniaki Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000129.6 | 05.01.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040001516 | 06.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004001516 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598730 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598730 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598730 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04M1/247, H04M1/274 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/0233 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M2250/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/31] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für das Stützen einer Eingangsbestätigung in einer beweglichen Terminalvorrichtung | [2008/44] | English: | System and method for supporting input confirmation in mobile terminal device | [2005/47] | French: | Système et méthode pour soutenir la confirmation d'entrée dans un dispositif terminal mobile | [2005/47] |
Former [2005/47] | System und Verfahren für das Stützen einer Eingang Bestätigung in einer beweglichen Terminalvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2008 | 17.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4140780 (GOEBEL MATTHIAS DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]US6067081 (HAHLGANSS GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 30 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002149561 (FUKUMOTO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0336]; figures 1-63 *; | [A]DE10154643 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] *; | [Y] - "NOKIA USER'S GUIDE", NOKIA 2110 USER'S GUIDE, NOKIA, HELSINKI, FI, (1996), no. 6, pages 1 - 100, XP000962431 [Y] 1-17 * page 40 - page 50 * |