EP1679767 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pantke, Heiko Rolshoverstrasse 4 51105 Köln / DE | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000145.2 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679767 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1679767 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
H01R13/62955 (EP);
H01R13/62938 (EP);
H01R13/62944 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Steckverbinder | [2006/28] | English: | Electrical connector | [2006/28] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | IE | 26.03.2008 | LT | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | PL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | IS | 26.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
LT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
IS | 26.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003068397 ; | [X]EP1028494 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1077512 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001019908 (ZWEIGLE PETER [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030703), vol. 2003, no. 07, & JP2003068397 A 20030307 (MOLEX JAPAN CO LTD; FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [X] 1,2,6-11 * the whole document * |