EP1586228 - Thread connection, in particular to the attachment of a tool or a tool adapter, at an extension mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciret Holdings AG Karl-Maybach-Strasse 18 88239 Wangen / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauer, Helmut Alpenstrasse 37 88279 Amtzell / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Otten, Herbert Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Otten, Herbert Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000432.4 | 12.01.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | DE20041019237 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004019237 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586228 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586228 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01B1/22, F16B7/18 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
F16B7/182 (EP,US);
Y10T403/50 (EP,US);
Y10T403/556 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | Gewindeverbindung, insbesondere zur Befestigung eines Werkzeugs oder eines Werkzeugadapters, an einer Verlängerungseinrichtung | [2005/42] | English: | Thread connection, in particular to the attachment of a tool or a tool adapter, at an extension mechanism | [2005/42] | French: | Raccordement de fil, en particulier à l'attachement d'un outil ou d'un adapteur d'outil, à un mécanisme de prolongation | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | LT | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | LU | 12.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | BG | 14.02.2008 | IS | 14.03.2008 | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/36] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | EE | 14.11.2007 | |
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | LT | 14.11.2007 | |
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | LT | 14.11.2007 | |
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | LT | 14.11.2007 | |
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB789697 (EDWIN LLOYD WARD) [X] 1-3,7-10 * page 1, column R, line 73 - page 2, column L, line 60; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]US5690181 (SHU CHUN-LI [TW]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US5897277 (BARRE BERNARD [FR], et al) [Y] 4-6* column 2, line 66 - column 6, line 29; figures 1-5 * |