EP1566258 - Apparatus for machining workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.04.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS Corpoplast GmbH & Co. KG Meiendorfer Strasse 203 20539 Hamburg / DE | [2009/11] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states SIG Technology Ltd. Laufengasse 18 8212 Neuhausen Rhine Falls / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herklotz, Thorsten Brauner Hirsch 16 b 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 02 /
Dose, Wolfgang Im Schönenfelde 27 21109 Hamburg / DE | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Hausfeld, Norbert, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Beselerstraße 6 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Hausfeld, Norbert, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Beselerstraße 6 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Klickow, Hans-Henning Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/34] | Klickow, Hans-Henning Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000444.9 | 12.01.2005 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | DE20041008400 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004008400 | [2005/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1566258 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1566258 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1566258 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/78, // B29C49/36, B29C49/06 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
B29C49/78 (EP);
B29C2049/78805 (EP);
B29C2049/78815 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP);
B29C49/36 (EP);
B29C49/6835 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29L2031/7158 (EP);
H04L2012/4026 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Werkstücken | [2005/34] | English: | Apparatus for machining workpieces | [2005/34] | French: | Appareil pour l'usinage de pièces | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2008
01.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Lohr, Georg, et al, et al Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | 02
31.07.2008
31.07.2013
WITHDRAWN KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2008
01.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Lohr, Georg, et al, et al Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
02
31.07.2008
31.07.2013
WITHDRAWN KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2008
01.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Lohr, Georg, et al, et al Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
02
31.07.2008
31.07.2013
WITHDRAWN KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2008
01.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Lohr, Georg, et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Junkersstrasse 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
02
31.07.2008
11.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2008
01.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Lohr, Georg, et al, et al Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | ||
02
31.07.2008
KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2008
Schleifring und Apparatebau GmbH Am Hardtanger 10 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Lohr, Georg, et al, et al Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 08.09.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.11.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.09.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/22] | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 19.12.2014 | Appeal received No. T2355/14 | 12.03.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.09.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 27.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.10.2007 | CZ | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | EE | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | GB | 31.10.2007 | IE | 31.10.2007 | LT | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | PL | 31.10.2007 | RO | 31.10.2007 | SI | 31.10.2007 | SK | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | LU | 12.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | BG | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | SE | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | ES | 11.02.2008 | IS | 29.02.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | HU | 01.05.2008 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
GB | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LU | 12.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
HU | 01.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
GB | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LU | 12.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
GB | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 31.10.2007 | |
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
GB | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
GB | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
GB | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | LT | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | LT | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19909307 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-17,20,21 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 63; figure . *; | [X]US6186760 (LATHAM GREIG S [US]) [X] 1-17,20,21 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 45 * * column 4, line 25 - column 4, line 48; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2002127294 (HOFMANN WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-17,20,21* paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] *; | [X]EP1306195 (SIG CORPOPLAST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-17,20,21 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0042]; figure 3 *; | [X]WO03078136 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [X] 1-17,20,21 * page 11, line 19 - page 14, line 17; figure 1 * * page 5, line 26 * * page 7, line 22 * |