EP1555732 - Method for manufacturing a nitride semiconductor laser diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/29] | Nitride semiconductor laser diode and method for manufacturing the same | ||
[2015/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2016/13] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khym, Sungwon 401, 494-92 Yonggang-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2016/13] |
Former [2005/29] | 01 /
Khym, Sungwon 401, 494-92 Yonggang-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05000651.9 | 14.01.2005 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | KR20040003891 | 19.01.2004 Original published format: KR 2004003891 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555732 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555732 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555732 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/343 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H02K15/02 (KR);
H01S5/34333 (EP,US);
H02K1/17 (KR);
H01S5/0215 (EP,US);
H01S5/0217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2016/13] |
Former [2008/14] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer nitriden Halbleiterlaserdiode | [2015/42] | English: | Method for manufacturing a nitride semiconductor laser diode | [2015/42] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une diode laser à semiconducteur à base de Nitrure | [2015/42] |
Former [2005/29] | Nitriden Halbleiterlaserdiode und deren Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2005/29] | Nitride semiconductor laser diode and method for manufacturing the same | ||
Former [2005/29] | Diode laser à semiconducteur à base de Nitrure et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 22.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1027940 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,16 * abstract *; | [X]US6455340 (CHUA CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003052316 (NIDO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,12,13,16* figure 7 *; | [A] - YANG M ET AL, "A selective growth of III-nitride by MOCVD for a buried-ridge type structure", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200106), vol. 226, no. 1, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 73 - 78, XP004242492 [A] 1,12,13,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(01)01021-1 | Examination | GB2346478 | KR20030040671 | by applicant | JPH1027940 | GB2346478 | US6455340 | US2003052316 | - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 226, no. 1, pages 73 - 78 |