EP1525889 - Liquid pharmaceutical composition containing an erythropoietin derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papadimitriou, Apollon Bachstrasse 38a 83673 Bichl / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Brodbeck, Michel, et al 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [2005/17] | Application number, filing date | 05000984.4 | 08.05.2001 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | EP20000110355 | 15.05.2000 Original published format: EP 00110355 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525889 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K9/08, A61K47/02, A61K47/18 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K38/22 (KR);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | LT | 27.10.2005 | Title | German: | Flüssige Arzneizubereitung enthaltend ein Erythropoietinderivat | [2005/17] | English: | Liquid pharmaceutical composition containing an erythropoietin derivative | [2005/17] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique liquide contenant un dérivé d'érythropoiétine | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01943331.7 / EP1311285 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010943331) is 19.09.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0178665 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-19,21,26,27,41,45,51,52,55-57,59 * claim - * * page 2, line 18 - line 35 ** table - *; | [X]GB2171304 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-5,8-19,22-27,41,42,45,51,52,55-57,59 * claims 1,3-7 * * example - * * page 1, line 8 - line 18 * * page 2, line 19 - line 39 *; | [X]US4992419 (WOOG HEINRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-18,21,22,24,26,27,41,45,51,52,55-57,59 * claim - * * example 5 * * table 2 *; | [X]WO9640073 (ALKERMES INC [US]) [X] 1-27,41,42,45,51,52,55-57,59 * claims 19-25 * * page 4, line 13 - line 19 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 11 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 15 * * page 14, line 7 - line 14 * * example 1 * * table I *; | [X]EP0909564 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-19,22,24,26,27,41,45,51,52,55-57,59 * claim - * * page 3, line 5 - line 50 * |