EP1684263 - Method of generating a footprint for an audio signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/30] | Method of generating a footprint for a useful signal | ||
[2009/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cugate AG c/o Kanzlei Tarabochia Bavariaring 44 80336 München / DE | [2010/50] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Unlimited Media GmbH In Wennebostel 26a 30900 Wedemark / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhein, Hanspeter In Wennebostel 26a 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05001258.2 | 21.01.2005 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684263 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684263 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10L11/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G10L19/018 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/83 (KR);
G10L19/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | Vervahren zum Erzeugen eines Abdrucks eines Audiosignals | [2006/30] | English: | Method of generating a footprint for an audio signal | [2009/51] | French: | Methode pour générer une empreinte d'un signal audio | [2009/51] |
Former [2006/30] | Method of generating a footprint for a useful signal | ||
Former [2006/30] | Methode pour générer un empreinte d'un signal utile | Examination procedure | 25.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 09.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | IE | 21.01.2011 | LU | 21.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/42] | BE | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 21.01.2011 | ||
LU | 21.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 21.01.2011 | ||
LU | 21.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | BE | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 21.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | BE | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | BE | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 05.05.2010 | |
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | FI | 05.05.2010 | |
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003205124 (FOOTE JONATHAN T [US], et al) [A] 1,10,13,15-20 * column A *; | [A]US2004158437 (KLEFENZ FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* column A; figure 4 *; | [X] - CANO P ET AL, "A review of algorithms for audio fingerprinting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 IEEE RADAR CONFERENCE. HUNTSVILLE, AL, MAY 5 - 8, 2003, IEEE RADAR CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021209), ISBN 0-7803-7920-9, pages 169 - 173, XP010642539 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - HERRE J ET AL, "Robust matching of audio signals using spectral flatness features", 2001 IEEE WORKSHOP ON THE APPLICATIONIS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20011021), ISBN 0-7803-7126-7, pages 127 - 130, XP010566891 [X] 1-9,13,15-20 * abstract * * section 2. Matching features and requirement * | [A] - HAITSMA J ET AL, "Speed-change resistant audio fingerprinting using auto-correlation", 2003 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP), HONG KONG, (20030406), VOL. 1 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7663-3, pages IV-728 - IV-731, XP010641263 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * section 2. Existing algorithm * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2003.1202746 | by applicant | - CANO ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (20021209), pages 169 - 173 |