EP1583264 - Optical LAN and state monitoring method for electrical load devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/40] | Optical lan device and state monitoring method for electrical load devices | ||
[2007/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [2008/11] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okubo, Youichi Pacific Ind. Co., Ltd., 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | 02 /
Kawase, Shinichi Pacific Ind. Co., Ltd., 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Breit, Ulrich, et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05001794.6 | 28.01.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040105801 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105801 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583264 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583264 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/213 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04B10/27 (EP,US);
H04B10/2755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches LAN und Verfahren zur Überwachung des Zustandes der elektrischen Lasteinrichtungen | [2007/40] | English: | Optical LAN and state monitoring method for electrical load devices | [2007/40] | French: | Réseau optique local et méthode pour la supervision de l'état des charges électriques | [2007/40] |
Former [2005/40] | Optisches lokales Netzwerkgerät und Verfahren zur Überwachung des Zustandes der elektrischen Lasteinrichtungen | ||
Former [2005/40] | Optical lan device and state monitoring method for electrical load devices | ||
Former [2005/40] | Dispositif pour réseau optique local et méthode pour la supervision de l'état des charges électriques | Examination procedure | 20.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4422180 (WENDT HANS J [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 7 * * column 13, line 45 - line 64 * * column 14, line 4 - line 12 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0194915 (RENAULT [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 1, line 19 - line 27 * * page 2, line 5 - line 22 * * page 4, line 15 - line 30 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 7 * * page 5, line 14 - line 17 * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - ORMOND T, "FIBER-OPTICS/MICROCOMPUTER COMBINATION REPLACES AUTOMOTIVE WIRING HARNESSES", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO. NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, US, (19801105), vol. 25, no. 20, ISSN 0012-7515, page 79,81, XP001223731 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |