EP1609406 - Light measurement system for living body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Tsuyoshi Hitachi, Ltd. Int. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2005/52] | Application number, filing date | 05001807.6 | 28.01.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | JP20040184407 | 23.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004184407 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609406 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B10/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
A61B5/14553 (EP,US);
A61B5/0042 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0233 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/36] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtmessgerät für den lebenden Körper | [2005/52] | English: | Light measurement system for living body | [2005/52] | French: | Système lumineux de mesure pour être vivant | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5853370 (CHANCE BRITTON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 30- - column 8, line 35; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0124691 (INSTRUMENTARIUM CORP [FI]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 30; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1245192 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1374778 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |