EP1561418 - Analyzer, cartridge, cartridge kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2011/33] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Sysmex Corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawa, Kenichi 1-13-10-101, Santanda-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0024 / JP | 02 /
Maekawa, Yasunori 3-5-2 Mikatadai, Nishiku Kobe 651-2277 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Toshiyuki 4-10-303 Natsugi-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0024 / JP | 04 /
Nagaoka, Kanako 6-7-202 Gongen-chou Suma-ku Kobe 654-0031 / JP | 05 /
Okada, Seiki 1-3-7-303 Shinonomedori Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0079 / JP | 06 /
Hagino, Kei 4-16-3 Kouzidai Nishi-ku Kobe 651-2273 / JP | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002028.8 | 01.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040026483 | 03.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004026483 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561418 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561418 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/33] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Analysegerät, Patrone, Patronenkit | [2011/09] | English: | Analyzer, cartridge, cartridge kit | [2005/32] | French: | Analyseur, cartouche, kit à cartouche | [2005/32] |
Former [2005/32] | Analysegerät, Patrone, Patronekit | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2005 | AT | 17.08.2011 | BE | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | IT | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | ES | 28.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | IE | 01.02.2012 | LU | 01.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LU | 01.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0074763 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 9, line 5 - line 20 * * page 15, line 9 - line 16 * * page 17, line 8 - line 14 * * page 18, line 1 - line 25 * * page 19, line 13 - page 20, line 5 * * page 21, line 24 - page 22, line 1 * * page 55, line 13 - page 56, line 2 * * page 61, line 9 - line 32 *; | [X]US2003143746 (SAGE BURTON H [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10* paragraphs [0028] - [0032] * | by applicant | WO9600110 | WO0074763 | US2003143746 |