EP1563750 - Breathable sole structure for footwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgard Inc. 13800 South Lakes Drive Charlotte South Carolina 28273 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Celgard Inc. 13800 South Lakes Drive Charlotte, South Carolina 28273 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lechhart, Fridtjof Diestelstrasse 5 22397 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Martin, Tim W. 5100 Lindstrom Drive Charlotte North Carolina 28226 / DE | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Schröder, Richard, et al CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Schröder, Richard, et al CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002089.0 | 02.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | US20040775350 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: US 775350 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563750 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/12, A43B7/08, A43B13/12 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A43B13/026 (EP,US);
A47J27/0815 (KR);
A43B13/12 (EP,US);
A43B13/125 (EP,US);
A43B7/08 (EP,US);
A43B7/125 (EP,US);
A47J36/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/19] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufbau für atmungsaktive Schuhsohle | [2005/33] | English: | Breathable sole structure for footwear | [2005/33] | French: | Structure pour semelle de chaussure respirante | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.04.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0382904 (POL SCARPE SPORTIVE SRL [IT]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE19917369 (GORE W L & ASS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 10, line 16 - column 11, line 10; figure 3 *; | [X]US6389711 (POLEGATO MARIO [IT]) [X] 1-13 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 15 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 7; figure 3bis *; | [A]US2002066212 (PAVELESCU LIVIU [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] - [0042]; figure - * | by applicant | US5044096 |