EP1562182 - Compensation for jitter in servo signal within data storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jae-hyeong 305-801, Byucksan 3-cha Apt. Jukjeon 2-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002545.1 | 07.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | KR20040007825 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: KR 2004007825 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1562182 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1562182 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562182 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/596, G11B7/095, G11B7/08, G11B21/03 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
G11B5/59627 (EP,US);
B01D53/323 (KR);
A61L9/22 (KR);
B01D46/12 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
G11B21/03 (EP,US);
H05H1/24 (KR);
B01D39/2055 (KR);
B01D46/0028 (KR);
B01J20/20 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/36] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kompensation des Servosignalzitterns in einem Datenspeichergerät | [2005/32] | English: | Compensation for jitter in servo signal within data storage device | [2005/32] | French: | Compensation de vacillement de signal servo dans un appareil d'emmagasinage de données | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0094313 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8-14,18-20 * the whole document * [Y] 7,17; | [X]US6366631 (NAKAYAMA AKIHITO [SG], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11-14,16 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2003123180 (SETTJE CHRISTOPHER THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-16,18-20 * the whole document * [Y] 7,17; | [A] - ONUKI Y ET AL, "Compensation for repeatable tracking errors in hard drives using discrete-time repetitive controllers", ADVANCED MOTION CONTROL, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 6TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MARCH 30 - APRIL 1, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000330), ISBN 0-7803-5976-3, pages 490 - 495, XP010508028 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AMC.2000.862922 |