EP1575325 - Estimating the location of inexpensive wireless terminals by using signal strength measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | [2009/29] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Avaya Technology Corp. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ju, Wen-Hua 100 Kingsland Circle Monmouth Junction NJ 08852 / US | 02 /
Krishnakumar, Anjur Sundaresan 11 Merritt Lane Rocky Hill NJ 08553 / US | 03 /
Krishnan, P. 1275 Rock Avenue Apt. F2 North Plainfield NJ 07060 / US | 04 /
Landwehr, James M. 6 Clearview Drive Summit NJ 07901 / US | 05 /
Mallows, Colin L. 16 Vinson Drive Flemington NJ 08822 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002773.9 | 10.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | US20040776058 | 11.02.2004 Original published format: US 776058 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575325 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1575325 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575325 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/02528 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/10 (KR);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Bestimmung des Standortes von preiswerten drahtlosen Endgeräten durch Verwendung von Signalstärkemessungen | [2005/37] | English: | Estimating the location of inexpensive wireless terminals by using signal strength measurements | [2005/37] | French: | Estimation de la position de terminaux sans fil à faible coût en utilisant des mesures d'intensité de signal | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.2009 | BE | 01.04.2009 | CY | 01.04.2009 | CZ | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | EE | 01.04.2009 | LT | 01.04.2009 | PL | 01.04.2009 | RO | 01.04.2009 | SI | 01.04.2009 | SK | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | BG | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | ES | 12.07.2009 | IS | 01.08.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | HU | 02.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CY | 01.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
HU | 02.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CY | 01.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
PL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LT | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | LT | 01.04.2009 | |
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | SI | 01.04.2009 | |
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 01.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6026304 (HILSENRATH OLIVER [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,15-18,28,29 * column 3, line 3 - line 31 * * column 4, line 36 - line 65 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 7 * * column 8, line 41 - column 10, line 10 * * figures 3,4,11A * [Y] 7,9-14,19-27,30; | [Y]US6393294 (PEREZ-BREVA LUIS [ES], et al) [Y] 7,9-14,19-27,30 * column 1, line 47 - line 53 * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 40 * * column 10, line 4 - line 25 *; | [A]US6466797 (FRODIGH MAGNUS [SE], et al) [A] 4,8,9,17,28 * column 3, line 7 - line 20 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 29 ** figure 2a *; | [A]US2003043073 (GRAY MATTHEW K [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1,3A,3B *; | [A] - RONG-HONG JAN ET AL, "An indoor geolocation system for wireless LANs", PARALLEL PROCESSING WORKSHOPS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 6-9 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031006), ISBN 0-7695-2018-9, pages 29 - 41, XP010664024 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPPW.2003.1240350 | by applicant | US6026304 | US6393294 |