EP1568709 - Purification of fibrinogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2007/12] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states ZLB Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metzner, Hubert Im Boden 6 35041 Marburg / DE | 02 /
Liebing, Uwe Kasseler Strasse 46 35091 Coelbe / DE | 03 /
Feussner, Annette Langewiesenweg 10 35043 Marburg / DE | 04 /
Lemmer, Joerg Wermertshaeuserstrasse 10 35085 Ebsdorfergrund / DE | 05 /
Schulte, Stefan Bauerbacher Strasse 46 35043 Marburg / DE | 06 /
Gawantka, Volker Am Damm 5 35094 Lahntal / DE | [2005/35] | Application number, filing date | 05003017.0 | 12.02.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | DE20041009400 | 24.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004009400 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1568709 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1568709 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1568709 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/75 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
A61C3/06 (KR);
A46B15/0032 (KR);
A46B7/04 (KR);
A46B9/04 (KR);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Fibrinogen | [2005/35] | English: | Purification of fibrinogen | [2005/35] | French: | Purification du fibrinogène | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.04.2010 | 21.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10182320.1 / EP2264069 | EP10183940.5 / EP2267025 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2005 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4096136 (AYERS JOHN STEPHEN, et al) [X] 1,2,9-23,26 * das gesamte Dokument, insbesondere Spalten 1 and 2, Beispiel 3 und die Ansprüche *; | [XD]DE2903131 (BIOTEST SERUM INSTITUT GMBH) [XD] 19-26 * page 15; examples 1,3; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0311950 (BIOTEST PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [X] 19-26 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 12 *; | [AD]EP0366946 (NEW YORK BLOOD CENTER INC [US]) [AD] * page 4 - page 6; claims 1,10 *; | [XD]WO9305067 (BAXTER INT [US]) [XD] 19-26 * page 7, line 4 - line 20; example 1; claim 1 *; | [XD]WO0017234 (PPL THERAPEUTICS SCOTLAND LTD [GB], et al) [XD] 19-26 * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 24; example 1; claim 1 *; | [XD]WO0127623 (VI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [XD] 19-26 * page 2 - page 3; claims 1,11 *; | [X]WO2004007533 (NAT BLOOD AUTHORITY [GB], et al) [X] 19-26 * page 4 - page 5; example 4; claims 1,15-20 *; | [X] - JENNISSEN HP, "Critical hydrophobicity HIC", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2003), Database accession no. PREV200300401530, XP002342368 [X] 19-26 * column A * | [A] - GOHEEN S C ET AL, "Protein losses in ion-exchange and hydrophobic interaction high-performance liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000818), vol. 890, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 73 - 80, XP004228911 [A] * page 77; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00572-0 | [ ] - FASEB JOURNAL, (200303), vol. 17, no. 4-5, ISSN 0892-6638, page 631.14 | Examination | US6037457 | - LOTTSPEICH; ZORBAS (HERAUSGEBER), Bioanalytik, HEIDELBERG, BERLIN (DE), SPEKTRUM AKADEMISCHER VERLAG, (19980101), pages 42 - 44 | - SCOPES R.K., Protein Purification, Principles and Practice, SPRINGER VERLAG, (19940101), page 46 | - LANGER B.G. ET AL, "Deglycosylation of Fibrinogen Accelerates Polymerization and Increases Lateral Aggregation of Fibrin Fibers", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19881015), vol. 263, no. 29, pages 15056 - 15063 | - MOSESSON M.W.; FINLAYSON J.S., "Preparation and analysis of fibrinogen subfractions", J. LAB. & CLIN. MED., (19631001), vol. 63, no. 4, pages 663 - 674 | by applicant | DE2636757 | DE2903131 | US4188318 | US4210580 | DE2902158 | EP0103196 | EP0173242 | WO8912065 | EP0359593 | EP0366946 | EP0383234 | WO9012803 | EP0408029 | WO9101808 | US5043428 | US5094960 | US5099003 | US5138034 | WO9305067 | EP0555135 | WO9317776 | US5252709 | WO9525748 | WO9602571 | US5639940 | EP0789030 | US5723579 | US5773033 | US5783663 | US5834420 | WO9905176 | WO9920655 | WO9937680 | WO9951724 | US6037457 | WO0017234 | WO0017239 | WO0127623 | WO0148016 | - JAKOBSEN; KIERULF, THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1973), vol. 3, pages 145 - 159 | - TAKEDA, JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1966), vol. 45, pages 103 - 111 | - VILA ET AL., THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1985), vol. 39, pages 651 - 656 | - BLOMBäCK; BLOMBäCK, ARKIV FöR KEMI, (1956), vol. 10, pages 415 - 443 | - SUZUKI ET AL., THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1980), vol. 18, pages 707 - 715 | - DEMPFLE; HEENE, THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 46, pages 19 - 27 | - VUENTO; VAHERI, BIOCHEM. J., (1979), vol. 183, pages 331 - 337 | - DEUTSCH; MERTZ, SCIENCE, (1970), vol. 170, pages 1095 - 1096 | - MATSUDA ET AL., THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1972), vol. 1, pages 619 - 630 | - SCOTT ET AL., ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (1986), vol. 249, pages 480 - 488 | - ACTA-HAEMATOL., (1957), vol. 17, pages 237 - 246 | - SIERRA, JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS APPLICATIONS, (1993), vol. 7, pages 309 - 352 | - MARTINOWITZ; SPOTNITZ, THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1997), vol. 78, pages 661 - 666 | - RADOSEVICH ET AL., VOX SANGUINIS, (1997), vol. 72, pages 133 - 143 | - M.G. SCHLAG; R. HOPF; U. ZIFKO; H. REDL, ACTA NEUROCHIR, (2002), vol. 144, pages 63 - 69 |