EP1564602 - Developing device, image forming apparatus, image forming system, and method of manufacturing developing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Katsumi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003026.1 | 14.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | JP20040037141 | 13.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004037141 | JP20040037142 | 13.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004037142 | JP20040064809 | 08.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004064809 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1564602 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1564602 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G03G15/0896 (EP,US);
G03G15/0812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/03] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklungsgerät, Bilderzeugungsapparat, Bilderzeugungssystem und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Entwicklungsapparates. | [2005/33] | English: | Developing device, image forming apparatus, image forming system, and method of manufacturing developing device | [2005/33] | French: | Dispositif de développement , appareil de formation des images, systéme de formation des images et procede destines a la production d' un dispositif de développement. | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS564168 (CANON KK) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]US6038416 (OKANO TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * columns 3-5 * * abstract *; | [XD]JP2003270928 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [XD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0031] , [0038] , [0042] , [0043] , [0054] * * abstract * |