EP1574915 - Apparatus and method for cleaning an image transfer device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gila, Omer 7574 Waterford Drive Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Lee, Michael H. 715 Seawood Way San Jose CA 95120 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Schoppe, Fritz Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003061.8 | 14.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | US20040799808 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: US 799808 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574915 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574915 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00, G03G15/16 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G03G21/0088 (EP,US);
G03G15/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/22] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zur Reinigung einer Bildübertragungsvorrichtung | [2005/37] | English: | Apparatus and method for cleaning an image transfer device | [2005/37] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage d'un dispositif de transfert d'images | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/37] | Appareil de nettoyage d'un dispositif de tranfert d'images | Examination procedure | 24.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 16.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03152587 ; | [A]JPH0683248 ; | [A]JP2002132104 ; | [A]JPS60162279 ; | [A]US4436054 (CEELEN THEODORUS M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910926), vol. 015, no. 382, Database accession no. (P - 1257), & JP03152587 A 19910628 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940628), vol. 018, no. 343, Database accession no. (P - 1761), & JP06083248 A 19940325 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002132104 A 20020509 (KYOCERA MITA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860111), vol. 010, no. 007, Database accession no. (P - 419), & JP60162279 A 19850824 (RICOH KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |