EP1598927 - Voltage regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House Wildey Business Park Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House, Wildey Business Park, Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutardja, Sehat 27330 Elena Road Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003200.2 | 15.02.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | US20040810452 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: US 810452 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598927 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598927 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G05F1/652 (EP,US);
H02M3/155 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/16] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spannungswandler | [2005/47] | English: | Voltage regulator | [2005/47] | French: | Régulateur de tension | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 07.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003038615 (ELBANHAWY ALAN [US]) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0032] * * figure 1a/b *; | [XY] - KAIWEI YAO ET AL, "Tapped-inductor buck converters with a lossless clamp circuit", APEC 2002. 17TH. ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. DALLAS, TX, MARCH 10 - 14, 2002; [ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020310), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7404-1, pages 693 - 698, XP010582995 [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11,14,15 * Section 2 * * Section 2.1 * * Section 2.2 * * Section 3 * * Section 4 * * Section 5 * * Equation 4 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 6 * [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2002.989321 | [XY] - PENG XU ET AL, "Multiphase Coupled-Buck Converter-A Novel High Efficient 12 V Voltage Regulator Module", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030101), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0885-8993, XP011078307 [X] 10,12,13 * Section 3 * * figure 5 * [Y] 12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2002.807082 | [Y] - PANOV Y ET AL, "Design considerations for 12-V/1.5-V, 50-A voltage regulator modules", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 2000. APEC 2000. FIFTEENTH ANNUAL IEEE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 6-10 FEB. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000206), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-5864-5, pages 39 - 46, XP010371691 [Y] 7 * figures 9,10a/b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2000.826080 |