EP1533703 - Method for controlling non-volatile semiconductor memory system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yoshiyuki 2-35-35-401 Shishigaya, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yatabe, Makoto 1647-302, Fukaya-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Sato, Takeaki 5-16-9, Hirado-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawamoto, Kazuya 2-1-18, Kyowa, Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003250.7 | 10.08.1998 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | JP19970214561 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21456197 | JP19980119099 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11909998 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1533703 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1533703 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F12/00, G11C11/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
G11C16/102 (EP,US);
G11C16/00 (KR);
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G06F3/0613 (EP,US);
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US);
G11C16/225 (EP,US);
G11C5/143 (EP,US);
G06F3/0664 (EP,US);
G11C29/76 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | G06F12/00, G11C11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines nichtflüchtigen Halbleiterspeichersystems | [2005/21] | English: | Method for controlling non-volatile semiconductor memory system | [2005/21] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un système de mémoire non-volatile à semi-conducteur | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98114979.2 / EP0896280 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5210855 (BARTOL THOMAS M [US]) [A] 13* abstract *; | [X]EP0712067 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * figures 2,3,5,6,9 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 22 * * column 5, line 52 - column 5, line 58 * * column 6, line 6 - column 6, line 10 *; | [X]DE19623853 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-7B * * tables 1,2 * * page 2, line 52 - page 2, line 54 * * page 3, line 63 - page 5, line 32 * |