EP1574384 - System and method assisting a vehicle driver via changes in accelerator reaction force and engine output characteristic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Tomohiro D-808, 5, Noukendaihigashi Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner, Patentanwälte, Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003694.6 | 21.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | JP20040069514 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004069514 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574384 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574384 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574384 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K26/02, B60K31/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W50/16 (EP,US);
F02D41/021 (EP,US);
F02D41/2422 (EP,US);
B60K26/021 (EP,US);
B60W2554/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Unterstützung eines Fahrzeugführers mittels Änderungen der Gaspedal Reaktionskraft und der Motorausgangs- Leistungscharakteristik | [2005/37] | English: | System and method assisting a vehicle driver via changes in accelerator reaction force and engine output characteristic | [2005/37] | French: | Système et procédure pour assister un conducteur d'un véhicule à l'aide des changements des forces de réactions d'une pédale d'accélérateur et de la caractéristique de la puissance fournie par le moteur | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10212674 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,16-18* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1375234 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6-9,11,13-18 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 55 * * figures 1,11 *; | [Y]EP1375232 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6-9,11,13-18 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0047] * * figures 7,11,12 *; | [A]EP1375280 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,5,16-18 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10166889 | JP2003063430 | US2003060936 |