EP1571731 - Method of manufacturing a connection between a plurality of varnish-insulated conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73, Oaza Miyota, Miyota-Machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73, Oaza Miyota, Miyota-Machi Kitasaku-gun Nagano-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blind, Sven Spinnfabrik 2 78573 Wurmlingen / DE | 02 /
Wörner, Norbert Hölzleweg 46 78054 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
Konrad, Rainer Karlsruher Strasse 17/1 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau/B. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau/B. / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003715.9 | 22.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | DE20041010723 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004010723 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571731 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/02 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
H01R4/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/21] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer elektrischen Verbindung zwischen mehreren lackisolierten Leitern | [2005/36] | English: | Method of manufacturing a connection between a plurality of varnish-insulated conductors | [2005/36] | French: | Procédé pour établir une connection entre plusieurs conducteurs vernis | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4034152 (WARNER ALLAN S) [Y] 10 * column 3, line 53 - line 63 *; | [Y]US4396819 (MUCHKIN VADIM V [SU], et al) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 11 - line 17 *; | [A]EP0314319 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [Y]GB2232013 (SHIN KIN ENTERPRISES CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8,10,11 * page 5, line 1 - line 17 *; | [Y]EP0410211 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2,6 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9627220 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,11 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 7 * |