EP1588953 - Foil bag from two or multiple layer composite film with hand hole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordenia Deutschland Halle GmbH Wielandstrasse 2 33790 Halle / DE | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Block, Joachim Elsa-Brändström-Strasse 5 33790 Halle (Westfalen) / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003837.1 | 08.03.2004 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588953 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588953 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/08 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
B65D33/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Title | German: | Folienbeutel aus einer zwei- oder mehrlagigen Verbundfolie mit einer Griffausstanzung | [2005/43] | English: | Foil bag from two or multiple layer composite film with hand hole | [2005/43] | French: | Sac en film multicouche muni de poignées | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 30.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04005425.6 / EP1574447 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | IE | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | PL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | ES | 07.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2359759 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3232321 (BISCHOF & KLEIN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0266670 (STIEGLER MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1129960 (GOGLIO SPA LUIGI MILANO [IT]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |