EP1538836 - Television reception system, channel selection apparatus and display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2013/50] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Satoru c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6 Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshikawa, Munehiro c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6 Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Uchiumi, Noriyuki c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6 Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/32] |
Former [2005/23] | 01 /
Maeda, Satoru Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6 Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshikawa, Munehiro Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6 Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Uchiumi, Noriyuki Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6 Chome Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/23] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05003838.9 | 08.06.2001 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | JP20000177896 | 14.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000177896 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1538836 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1538836 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538836 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/38, H04N7/00 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/4122 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4383 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4786 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/6175 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/38 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | H04N7/00, H04N5/44, H04N5/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/23] | Title | German: | Fernsehempfangssystem, Kanalwahleinrichtung und Anzeigevorrichtung | [2005/23] | English: | Television reception system, channel selection apparatus and display apparatus | [2005/23] | French: | Système de réception de télévision, dispositif de sélection de canal et dispositif d'affichage | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01305021.6 / EP1164790 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010305021) is 20.09.2004 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9803012 (BROWN DOUGLAS G [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 13, line 1 - page 21, line 2; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9816065 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5982363 (NAIFF KENNETH L [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - column 10, line 19 *; | [X]WO0031982 (BEHAGEN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract ** page 5, line 1 - page 13, line 18 * |