EP1575083 - Method of manufacturing a semiconductor device and semiconductor device obtainable with such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Interuniversitair Micro-Elektronica Centrum Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Interuniversitair Micro-Elektronica Centrum Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pawlak, Bartlomiej Jan Ijzerenmolenstraat 152/53 3001 Leuven / BE | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goen & Co, Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 05003848.8 | 23.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | EP20040101013 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04101013 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575083 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1575083 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L21/8238, H01L27/07, H01L27/092 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H01L29/7834 (EP);
H01L21/823807 (EP);
H01L21/823814 (EP);
H01L21/823828 (EP);
H01L29/66484 (EP);
H01L29/66795 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterbauelementes und mit dieser Methode herstellbares Halbleiterbauelement | [2005/37] | English: | Method of manufacturing a semiconductor device and semiconductor device obtainable with such a method | [2005/37] | French: | Méthode pour la fabrication d'un dispositif semiconducteur pouvant être obtenu avec une telle méthode | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5391506 (TADA YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-11 * figure 8 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]US2002011612 (HIEDA KATSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 6 * figure 58 *; | [A]US6458662 (YU BIN [US]) [A] 2,3 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 8; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US2002153587 (ADKISSON JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0070]; figure 18B *; | [DA]US2002192911 (PARKE STEPHEN A [US]) [DA] 1-11* figure 8D *; | [X]US2003227036 (SUGIYAMA NAOHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-11 * paragraph [0140]; figure 26 * |