EP1596547 - Method for constructing and processing a frame in synchronous ethernet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Se-Youn Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Song, Jae-Yeon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Seo-Won Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Yoon, Jong-Ho Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004121.9 | 25.02.2005 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | KR20040034379 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: KR 2004034379 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1596547 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/64 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildung und Verarbeitung eines Datenrahmens in synchronen Ethernet | [2005/46] | English: | Method for constructing and processing a frame in synchronous ethernet | [2005/46] | French: | Procédé de construction et traitement d' une trame de données dans Ethernet synchron | [2005/46] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 11.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |