EP1582397 - Seat device for a vehicle and vehicle provided therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumida, Kazue c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Akira c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
Toyota, Minoru c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2009/26] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
Sumida, Kazue c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Horshima 730-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
Ito, Akira c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Horshima 730-8670 / JP | |||
03 /
Toyota, Minoru c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Horshima 730-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004131.8 | 25.02.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040099921 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004099921 | JP20040099922 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004099922 | JP20040099928 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004099928 | JP20040099929 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004099929 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582397 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582397 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/01, B60N2/30, B60N2/06, B60N2/07, B60R22/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
B60N2/01 (EP,US);
B60N2/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/0735 (EP,US);
B60N2/3045 (EP,US);
B60N2/3056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sitzvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug und damit ausgerüstetes Fahrzeug | [2005/40] | English: | Seat device for a vehicle and vehicle provided therewith | [2005/40] | French: | Dispositif de siège pour véhicule et véhicule en étant muni | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5519608 ; | [X]FR1059830 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1 * figures 1-13 *; | [Y]US5407166 (PILARSKI REGIS V [US]) [Y] 12-14,17 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US2002021016 (BERGQUIST AKE [SE], et al) [X] 1-11,15,16,18-20 * figures 5,7,12 * [Y] 12-14,17; | [PA]EP1468880 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800415), vol. 004, no. 049, Database accession no. (M - 007), & JP55019608 A 19800212 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,12,17 * abstract * |