EP1589690 - Display apparatus, information terminal apparatus, network system, and network configuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Shingo c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004161.5 | 25.02.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | JP20040061423 | 04.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004061423 | JP20040377504 | 27.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004377504 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589690 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/06, H04N5/44 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
H04L41/0816 (EP,US);
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41415 (EP,US);
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/4367 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigegerät, Informationsendgerät, Netzwerksystem und Netzkonfigurationsverfahren | [2005/43] | English: | Display apparatus, information terminal apparatus, network system, and network configuring method | [2005/43] | French: | Appareil d'affichage, appareil terminal d'information, système de réseau et procédé de configuration de réseau | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.01.2010 | 12.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/23] | 29.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003028637 (GROSS CURTIS T [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003117532 (KARASAWA TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0078] *; | [X] - LCD PROJECTOR, "Sony SuperBright XGA Multimedia LCD Projector (VPL-PX15)", INTERNET ARTICLE, Internet, (20030727), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.lcdprojectoronline.com/vpl-px15.html, (20050831), XP002342920 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | [X] - DAVID COLIN, "Sony's 1st Peer-to-Peer Wireless Projector", INTERNET ARTICLE, Internet, (20021114), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.projectorcentral.com/wi-fi_sony_vpl_px15.htm, (20050831), XP002342921 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - KINDBERG T ET AL, "A Web-based nomadic computing system", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200103), vol. 35, no. 4, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 443 - 456, XP004304858 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(00)00181-X | Examination | JP2004007351 | EP1499067 |