EP1574826 - Optical displacement-measuring instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states MITUTOYO CORPORATION 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Takanori c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 24, Kiyohara Kogyo-danchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
Otsuka, Takanori Mitutoyo Corporation 24, Kiyohara Kogyo-danchi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-3231 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2005/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004751.3 | 03.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | JP20040070608 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004070608 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574826 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574826 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G01D5/34715 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/36] |
Former [2006/22] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Instrument zur Messung einer Verschiebung | [2005/37] | English: | Optical displacement-measuring instrument | [2005/37] | French: | Instrument optique pour mesurer un déplacement | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 15.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4577181 (LIPSCHER BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1,2* column 5, line 14 - line 26; figure 5 *; | [A]US4661698 (CAPPIO EMILIO C [IT], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - line 53 * | Examination | US4577101 | US5841133 | US6410911 | US6526190 | by applicant | US4577101 | US4661698 | US5841133 | US6410911 | US6526190 |