EP1570759 - Multipurpose spectacle case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKIA Optical Co., Ltd. 35/F Laws Commercial Plaza, 788 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states OKIA Optical Co. Ltd. 35/F Laws Commercial Plaza, 788, Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lam, Sik Lung B 2, 16 /F Greenville Garden Shui Fai Terrace 15 Stubbs Road Hong Kong P.R.C / CN | [2007/09] |
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
Lam, Sik Lung B 2, 16 /F Greenville Garden Shui Fai Terrace 15 Stubbs Road Hong Kong P.R.C / HK | ||
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
Lam, Sik Lung B 2, 16 /F Greenville Garden Shui Fai Terrace 15 Stubbs Road Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau D.A. Casalonga - Josse, Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004825.5 | 04.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | US20040794684 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: US 794684 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570759 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45C11/04 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A45C11/04 (EP,US);
A45C11/24 (EP,US);
A45C15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Mehrzweckbrillenetui | [2005/36] | English: | Multipurpose spectacle case | [2005/36] | French: | Etui à lunettes multifonctionnel | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1085022 ; | [XY]JP2003180433 ; | [XY]DE9314714U (KEUTER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4-8,10; | [XY]US5921383 (SHEFLER DON N [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 23 * [Y] 2,4-8,10; | [X]US2001004053 (TAORMINA DAVID [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] *; | [X]WO03056970 (CONTOUR OPTIK INC [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * page 3, line 8 - page 8, line 2; figures 5,15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10085022 A 19980407 (TOTO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,10 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003180433 A 20030702 (FUKUI CRAFT:KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 5,8 |