EP1544512 - Vehicle with a drivetrain having a multiple clutch device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Str. 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Str. 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | |||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Str. 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Str. 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhstrebe, Jochen Pfarrgasse 3 97318 Westheim / DE | 02 /
Moseler, Olaf Kroatengasse 7 97070 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Rohm, Axel Mainblick 3 97453 Schonungen / DE | 04 /
Steiner, Eduard Stephanstr. 9 97070 Würzburg / DE | 05 /
Reuthal, Rainer Prof.-Bauer-Str. 12 97294 Unterpleichfeld / DE | 06 /
Schneider, Hans-Jürgen Boxberg 46 97440 Werneck-Stettbach / DE | 07 /
Kundermann, Wolfgang An der Eselshöhe 179 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 08 /
Sudau, Jörg Einsteinstr. 8 97464 Niederwerrn / DE | 09 /
John, Thomas Hirtenweg 34 97529 Alitzheim / DE | 10 /
Strasser, Thomas Segnitzstr. 97 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2005/31] |
Former [2005/25] | 01 /
Kuhstrebe, Jochen Pfarrgasse 3 97318 Westheim / DE | ||
02 /
Moseler, Olaf Kroatengasse 7 97070 Würzburg / DE | |||
03 /
Rohm, Axel Mainblick 3 97453 Schonungen / DE | |||
04 /
Steiner, Eduard Gründewaldstr. 6 97072 Würzburg / DE | |||
05 /
Reuthal, Rainer Prof.-Bauer-Str. 12 97294 Unterpleichfeld / DE | |||
06 /
Schneider, Hans-Jürgen Boxberg 46 97440 Werneck-Stettbach / DE | |||
07 /
Kundermann, Wolfgang An der Eselshöhe 179 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | |||
08 /
Sudau, Jörg Einsteinstr. 8 97464 Niederwerrn / DE | |||
09 /
John, Thomas Hirtenweg 34 97529 Alitzheim / DE | |||
10 /
Strasser, Thomas Segnitzstr. 97 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005213.3 | 21.12.2001 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | DE2001101176 | 12.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10101176 | DE2001148424 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10148424 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1544512 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1544512 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1544512 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/04, F16H59/72, B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W10/10 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F16D25/123 (EP,US);
F16D48/0206 (EP,US);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
F16H57/0473 (EP,US);
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
F16H61/688 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60W2510/105 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2710/105 (EP,US);
B60W30/18118 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/428 (EP,US);
F16D2300/06 (EP,US);
F16D2300/14 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10412 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1045 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1085 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3069 (EP,US);
F16D2500/30803 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3122 (EP,US);
F16D2500/31466 (EP,US);
F16D2500/31493 (EP,US);
F16D2500/5029 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70426 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70464 (EP,US);
F16H2059/148 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0034 (EP,US);
F16H2061/023 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0422 (EP,US);
F16H2061/205 (EP,US);
F16H2306/48 (EP,US);
F16H2312/00 (EP,US);
F16H2312/02 (EP,US);
F16H2312/022 (EP,US);
F16H2312/06 (EP,US);
F16H2312/12 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H59/72 (EP,US);
F16H63/46 (EP,US);
F16H63/48 (EP,US);
F16H63/50 (EP,US);
F16H63/502 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19149 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19228 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | F16H61/04, F16H59/72, B60K41/28 | ||
Former IPC [2005/25] | F16H61/04, B60K41/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/10] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einem eine Mehrfach-Kupplungseinrichtung aufweisenden Antriebsstrang | [2005/25] | English: | Vehicle with a drivetrain having a multiple clutch device | [2005/25] | French: | Véhicule avec une chaîne de traction ayant un dispositif à embrayages multiples | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01985921.4 / EP1350044 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | IT | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09133207 ; | [A]US5181431 (ZAISER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,9,12 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 61 * * claims 11,12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5407401 (BULLMER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 9 * column 3, line 27 - line 31 * * column 6, line 9 - line 36 * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US5503039 (BAILLY GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 33 - line 37 * * column 2, line 8 - line 14 ** figure 2 *; | [X]US5890392 (LUDANEK HARALD [DE], et al) [X] 12,13 * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 12 * * column 11, line 1 - line 28 * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]FR2790297 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 15, line 19 - page 16, line 10 * * page 16, line 20 - line 27 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE19939819 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 12,13 * column 4, line 3 - line 12 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 14-16 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09133207 A 19970520 (JATCO CORP) [Y] 14-16 * abstract * | Examination | US5711409 | DE19631983 |