EP1701599 - Circuit board for hiding electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optium Care International Tech. Inc. 8F., No. 28, Lane 513 Rueiguang Rd., Neihu District 114 Taipei City / TW | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lien, Jeffrey 5F, No. 26, Alley 5, Lane 26, Shihdong Road Shihlin District Taipei City 111 Taiwan / TW | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Rössig, Rolf, et al Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Rössig, Rolf, et al Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005273.7 | 10.03.2005 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701599 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
H05K1/182 (EP);
H01L25/0652 (EP);
H01L25/105 (EP);
H05K1/183 (EP);
H01L2225/1029 (EP);
H01L2225/107 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H05K2201/09845 (EP);
H05K2201/10515 (EP);
H05K2201/10689 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Title | German: | Leiterplatte für das Verstecken von elektronischen Bauelementen | [2006/37] | English: | Circuit board for hiding electronic components | [2006/37] | French: | Carte de circuits pour cacher des composants électroniques | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0239587 ; | [XY]JPH09199824 ; | [XY]JPH02134890 ; | [XY]US5386343 (PAO YI-HSIN [US]) [X] 1,2,5-14 * abstract * * column 2, lines 25-43 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, lines 14-36 * * claims 10,11 * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]US6459593 (KWONG HERMAN [CA]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - column 6, line 25 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 42 * [Y] 3,4 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900420), vol. 014, no. 194, Database accession no. (E - 0919), & JP02039587 A 19900208 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-14 * abstract * [Y] 3,4 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09199824 A 19970731 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-14 * abstract * [Y] 3,4 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900810), vol. 014, no. 371, Database accession no. (E - 0963), & JP02134890 A 19900523 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,5-14 * abstract * [Y] 3,4 |