EP1582978 - Method and system for analyzing interaction among software artifacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramco Systems Limited No. 64 Sardar Patel Road, Taramani Chennai, Tamilnadu 600 113 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Ramco Systems Limited No. 64 Sardar Patel Road, Taramani Chennai, Tamilnadu 600 113 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meenakshisundaram, Krishnamoorthy 9, Sundar Rajan Street Abhiramapuram Chennai 600 018 / IN | 02 /
Devalla, Raghuram 16, 4th Cross Street NGO Colony Adambakkam Chennai 600 088 / IN | 03 /
Ramaswamy, Srinivasan Flat B Ground floor Best Nest Plaza 13th Street Thillai Ganga Nagar Nanganallur Chennai 600 061 / IN | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Esslinger, Alexander Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Clarke, Alison Clare HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05005377.6 | 11.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040553233P | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 553233 P | US20050060204P | 17.02.2005 Original published format: US 60204 P | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582978 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582978 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/45 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G06F8/433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Interaktionsanalyse zwischen Softwareentitäten | [2005/40] | English: | Method and system for analyzing interaction among software artifacts | [2005/40] | French: | Procédé et système d'analyse de l'interaction entre granules de logiciel | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2008 | 31.03.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5396627 (IITSUKA TAKAYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5485616 (BURKE MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 67 * * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 14 * * column 7, line 47 - column 13, line 18 * * claims 1-9 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5671419 (CARINI PAUL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X] - BARBARA, "Constructing the call graph of a program", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, (19790501), vol. SE-5, no. 3, pages 216 - 225, XP009052439 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 216, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph L * * page 217, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 6 * * page 217, column R, paragraph 2 - page 219, column R, paragraph 9 * * page 220, column L, paragraph L - page 223, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 224, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * page 224, column R, paragraph 4 - page 225, column R, paragraph 4 * | [A] - TRIOLET R ED - COSNARD M ET AL COSNARD M, "INTERPROCEDURAL ANALYSIS BASED RESTRUCTURING OF PROGRAMS", PARALLEL ALGORITHMS AND ARCHITECTURES. LUMINY, 14 - 18 APRIL, 1986, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON PARALLEL ALGORITMS & ARCHITECTURES, AMSTERDAM, NORTH HOLLAND, NL, (19860414), pages 203 - 217, XP000014784 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - KAMKAR M ET AL, "THREE APPROACHES TO INTERPROCEDURAL DYNAMIC SLICING", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19930901), vol. 38, no. 1 / 5, ISSN 0165-6074, pages 625 - 636, XP000383824 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(93)90203-W | [A] - BARRY K ROSEN, "High-Level Data Flow Analysis", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, (19771001), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 712 - 724, XP002342319 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/359842.359849 |