EP1577048 - Machining apparatus with two different machining devices and process for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trotec Produktions- und Vertriebs GMBH Linzer Strasse 156 4600 Wels / AT | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penz, Andreas Leppersdorf 67 4612 Scharten / AT | 02 /
Fazeny, Stephan Scharnsteiner Strasse 36 4810 Gmunden / AT | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Secklehner, Günter Rechtsanwalt Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Secklehner, Günter Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 05005553.2 | 15.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | AT20040000470 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: AT 4702004 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577048 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06, B23K26/20, B23K26/36, B23K26/42, B23P23/04 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B23K26/0604 (EP,US);
B23K26/0613 (EP,US);
B23K26/21 (EP,US);
B23K26/364 (EP,US);
B23K26/702 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/24] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bearbeitungsvorrichtung mit zwei unterschiedlichen Bearbeitungswerkzeugen und Verfahren zum Steuern derselben | [2005/38] | English: | Machining apparatus with two different machining devices and process for controlling the same | [2005/38] | French: | Machine d'usinage avec deux dispositifs d'usinage différents et méthode de commande de ce dernier | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.05.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57149118 ; | [X]DE1958430 (DOZLER GEB BAUSCHER ELISABETH) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,13,15,19-21,25-28,30 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [Y]US3710798 (BREDEMEIER H) [Y] 16-18,32-34 * column 4, lines 44-68; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US5126532 (INAGAWA HIDEHO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14,16-21,25-27,29,31-34 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 48; figures 2a-d,3-5 * [A] 4-7,21-24; | [X]US5207576 (VASSILIADIS ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-14,19,20,25-29 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]DE29517722U (FORACON MASCHINEN UND ANLAGENB [DE]) [X] 1,6,19,22 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 9; figure .; claim 6 *; | [X]US2002063113 (WIGGERMANN UDO [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,13,14,19-21,25,28,29,31 * paragraphs [0037] , [0039] , [0042] , [0043]; figure - *; | [AD]US6423925 (SUKHMAN YEFIM P [US], et al) [AD] 1-34* the whole document *; | [X]US2003047545 (MCKEE TERRY [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9,15,19-21,25,30 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0021] , [0025] , [0026]; figures 1,3a-b,4 *; | [XY]US2004011772 (OKUMURA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,10-14,19-21,25-27,29,31 * paragraphs [0078] - [0084] - [0088] , [0092] , [0093]; figures 2,3,4a-c * [Y] 16-18,32-34; | [E]WO2005044505 (LASERTEC GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-3,9,15,19-21,28,30 * page 4, lines 1-31 * * page 6, line 19 - page 9, line 20; figures 1,3,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821211), vol. 006, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 178), & JP57149118 A 19820914 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,7,19,23 * abstract * |