EP1602823 - Pressure pulsation dampener and fuel dosage pump with a pressure pulsation dampener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2007/38] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bächner, Stefan Staigstrasse 14 73630 Remshalden / DE | 02 /
Brodbeck, Oliver Badstrasse 14/1 72555 Metzingen-Neuhausen / DE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Ruttensperger, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006793.3 | 29.03.2005 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | DE20041024865 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004024865 | [2005/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602823 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1602823 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/04, F02M37/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
F23K5/142 (EP);
F02M2200/31 (EP);
F02M2200/315 (EP);
F02M55/04 (EP);
F02M69/02 (EP);
F23N2235/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, PL, SE [2006/33] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckpulsationsdämpfer und Kraftstoffdosierpumpe mit einem Druckpulsationsdämpfer | [2005/49] | English: | Pressure pulsation dampener and fuel dosage pump with a pressure pulsation dampener | [2005/49] | French: | Dispositif d'atténuation de pulsations et pompe de dosage de carburant avec un dispositif d'atténuation de pulsations | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 29.03.2008 | SE | 30.03.2008 | FR | 31.03.2008 | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/24] | SE | 30.03.2008 | |
FR | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | SE | 30.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1349155 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1-5,11 * page 1, line 85 - page 2, line 26 *; | [X]DE2924796 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-5,11 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2382623 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10,11 * page 7, paragraph 28 *; | [X]EP1371840 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US2004035399 (CURRAN STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11 * page 2, paragraph 31 - page 2, paragraph 32; figures 1,2 * |