EP1587299 - Compressing and decompressing image of a mobile communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
An, Sun-Hwan 203, 1420-11, Sillim 5-Dong Gwanak-Gu Seoul / KR | [2016/32] |
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
An, Sun-Hwan 203, 1420-11, Sillim 5-Dong, Gwanak-Gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2016/32] |
Former [2006/20] | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006807.1 | 29.03.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | KR20040025525 | 13.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004025525 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587299 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1587299 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587299 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/41, H04N1/64 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
H04N1/644 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Komprimierung und Dekomprimierung eines Bildes in einem mobilen Kommunikationsendgerät | [2005/42] | English: | Compressing and decompressing image of a mobile communication terminal | [2005/42] | French: | Compression et décompression d'une image dans un terminal de communication mobile | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 06.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2005 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | GB | 29.03.2017 | IE | 29.03.2017 | LU | 29.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.03.2005 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.03.2005 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9625010 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 2,10 * page 5, lines 8-26; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO03065709 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-20 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 8; figure 5 *; | [PA]US2004179731 (ONO TARIK [US], et al) [PA] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A] - BELLAACHIA A ET AL, "Fast searching over compressed text using a new coding technique: tagged sub-optimal code (TSC)", DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. DCC 2004 SNOWBIRD, UT, USA MARCH 23-25, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040323), ISBN 978-0-7695-2082-7, pages 526 - 526, XP010692584 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.2004.1281502 | by applicant | WO03065709 |