EP1582950 - Digital rights management system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Callaghan, David M. 10276 Chipmunk Ridge Drive Concord, OH 44077 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Jung HML Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006916.0 | 30.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040814539 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 814539 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582950 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582950 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/406 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (US);
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G06F21/62 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/45] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Verwaltung digitaler Rechte | [2005/40] | English: | Digital rights management system and method | [2005/40] | French: | Procédé et système de gestion de droits numériques | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 02.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2009 | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/47] | 07.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.07.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/47] | Request for further processing for: | 12.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0813132 (IBM [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 49; figure 1 *; | [X]WO02095506 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 12-21,30-41 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 16; figure 2 *; | [X]WO03036400 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 12-21,30-41 * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 27 *; | [XY]US2003145221 (ATZMUELLER CLEMENS [DE], et al) [X] 22,25-29 * paragraphs [0004] , [0012]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-11,23,24; | [X]DE10200681 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 12-21,30-41 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0032] - [0037] *; | [PXL]US2004168053 (KASZKIN ANDREAS [DE], et al) [PXL] 12-21,30-41 * translation aid for WO02/095506; paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 2 *; | [PXL]US2005021705 (JURISCH ANDREAS [DE]) [PXL] 12-21,30-41* translation aid for WO03/036400; paragraphs [0069] - [0075] *; | [XY] - PARK J S ET AL, "RBAC ON THE WEB BY SMART CERTIFICATES", PROCEEDINGS 4TH. ACM WORKSHOP ON ROLE-BASED ACCESS CONTROL. FAIRFAX, VA, OCT. 28 - 29, 1999, ACM ROLE-BASED ACCESS CONTROL WORKSHOP, NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19991028), ISBN 1-58113-180-1, pages 1 - 9, XP000958099 [X] 1 * page 2, column L - page 3, column R * [Y] 2-11,23,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/319171.319172 | [A] - NIKANDER P ET AL, "Policy and trust in open multi-operator networks", TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK INTELLIGENCE. IFIP TC6/WG6.7 SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENCE IN NETWORKS (SMARTNET 2000) KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS NORWELL, MA, USA, (2000), ISBN 0-7923-7932-2, pages 419 - 436, XP009055760 [A] 1-11,22-29 * pages 423,435 * |