EP1584419 - Method for operating a power driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Black & Decker 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forster, Michael K. 19814 Graystone Road White Hall, Maryland 21161 / US | 02 /
Schell, Craig A 2716 Kildaire Drive Baltimore, Maryland 21234 / US | 03 /
Gorti, Bhanu V 3205 Lanham Drive Abingdon, Maryland 21009 / US | 04 /
Cruise, Nathan J 2919 Stockton Road Phoenix, Maryland 21131 / US | 05 /
Woods, Samuel G 331 Point to Point Road Bel Air, Maryland 21015 / US | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/41] | 01 /
Forster, Michael K. 19814 Graystone Road White Hall, Maryland 21161 / US | ||
02 /
Schell, Craig A 2716 Kildaire Drive Baltimore, Maryland 21234 / US | |||
03 /
Gorti, Bhanu V 3205 Lanham Drive Abingdon, Maryland 21009 / US | |||
04 /
Cruise, Nathan J 1859 Edgewood Road Parkville, Maryland 21234 / US | |||
05 /
Woods, Samuel G 331 Point to Point Road Bel Air, Maryland 21015 / US | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker, 210 Bath Road Slough Berks SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05006981.4 | 31.03.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | US20040559349P | 02.04.2004 Original published format: US 559349 P | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584419 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584419 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/06, H02K7/02 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B25C1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Benutzen eines Leistungstreibers | [2005/41] | English: | Method for operating a power driver | [2005/41] | French: | Procédé d'emploi d'un entraînement mécanique | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Request for further processing for: | 07.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | LT | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | PL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | IS | 28.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 28.05.2008 | |
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0546834 (GLYNWED ENG [GB]) [A] 1-6,13-19,24,25* columns 11,12; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0662750 (SENCORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * columns 22-26; figure - *; | [X]US2002108474 (ADAMS SHANE [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0054] , [0087] , [0088] , [93.97.100] , [0106] - [0109] - [0114]; figures 1,18 *; | [A]US6705503 (PEDICINI CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * columns 3,6,9; figure - * |