EP1593880 - Control shaft of a lift-variable valve drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | |||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | |||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schleusener, Michael Wörthstrasse 18 a 81667 München / DE | 02 /
Eder, Torsten Zieblandstrasse 37 80798 München / DE | 03 /
Gallacher, Gerald Franz-Fackler-Strasse 57 80995 München / DE | 04 /
Halmanseger, Leonhard Martin-Stangl-Strasse 36 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | [2005/45] | Application number, filing date | 05007185.1 | 01.04.2005 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | DE20041021646 | 03.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004021646 | [2005/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593880 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593880 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H53/02, F01L1/047, B21D53/84, F01L13/00, F01L1/12 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
F01L13/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/28] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verstellwelle eines hubvariablen Ventiltriebs | [2005/45] | English: | Control shaft of a lift-variable valve drive | [2005/45] | French: | Arbre de commande pour une commande de soupapes à levée variable | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5007165 (PODHORSKY MIROSLAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5337626 (EVERTS ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5392511 (COPELAND MICHAEL M [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 2 * * abstract * * column 4, lines 40-45 * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5826461 (KAYWOOD ROY G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * [Y] 3; | [Y]DE19717660 (WANZKE HELGA [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract ** figure - *; | [XY]WO02072306 (MERZ KARL [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figure 5 * * abstract * [Y] 3; | [X]EP1347211 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]EP1371816 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 1 * * abstract * [Y] 3 |