EP1584412 - Sander with vertical handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Vincent P. 5729 Ridgedale Road Baltimore MD 21209 / US | 02 /
Van Wambeke, Weston J. 2428 Chetwood Circle No. 201 Timonium MD 21093 / US | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Clark, Charles Robert, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | Clark, Charles Robert, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05007263.6 | 04.04.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | US20040819248 | 06.04.2004 Original published format: US 819248 | US20040929195 | 30.08.2004 Original published format: US 929195 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584412 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584412 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/03 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B24B23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Schleifmaschine mit vertikalem Handgriff | [2005/41] | English: | Sander with vertical handle | [2005/41] | French: | Ponceuse à poignée verticale | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 19.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1545631 (BARRY JAMES J, et al) [A] 1-19 * figure - *; | [A]US2466584 (DUFF GEORGE L) [A] 1-19 * figure - *; | [A]FR1085718 (PEUGEOT & CIE) [A] 1-19 * figure - *; | [A]US2002131834 (LUI TAT NIN [HK], et al) [A] 1-19* figure - *; | [A]GB2378642 (SHINN FU CORP [TW]) [A] 1-19 * figure - * | by applicant | GB2378642 |