EP1584779 - Shock absorber for moving parts in a piece of furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agostino Ferrari S.p.A. Via Tiraboschi, 48 24122 Bergamo / IT | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Migli, Carlo Via del Pozzo 8 23900 Lecco LC / IT | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/26] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/41] | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05007371.7 | 05.04.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | IT2004MI00154U | 08.04.2004 Original published format: IT MI20040154 U | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584779 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584779 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584779 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/02, E05F5/10, E05F5/08 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
F16F7/09 (EP);
E05F5/02 (EP);
E05F5/08 (EP);
E05F5/10 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
E05Y2201/212 (EP);
E05Y2201/256 (EP);
E05Y2201/264 (EP);
E05Y2201/474 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2009/47] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dämpfer für bewegliche Möbelelemente | [2005/41] | English: | Shock absorber for moving parts in a piece of furniture | [2005/41] | French: | Amortisseur pour éléments mobiles de meuble | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 12.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.08.2010 | [2010/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4110868 (IMAZAIKE YASUTAKA) [A] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 50 - line 62 * * column 3, line 16 - line 21 * * column 4, line 24 - line 29 ** figure 1 *; | [A]WO9632868 (LORD CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 5 * * figure 11 *; | [A]EP1348828 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0018] , [0034] * * figure 4 * |