EP1559946 - Punching of annular elements from a band of fibrous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2006/33] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jessen, Erling Nederbyvaenget 106 6100 Haderslev / DK | 02 /
Jensen, Fleming Lund Trelle Ager 41 6580 Vamdrup / DK | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Colombier, Christian Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Colombier, Christian Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 05007774.2 | 10.07.2002 | [2005/31] | Priority number, date | WO2001DK00498 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: PCT/DK01/00498 | FR20010014106 | 31.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0114106 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559946 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559946 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, B26F1/46 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
F16L59/022 (EP);
F16L59/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | LT | 08.04.2005 | LV | 08.04.2005 | RO | 08.04.2005 | Title | German: | Stanzen von ringförmigen Elementen ausgehend von einem Band aus Faserstoff | [2005/31] | English: | Punching of annular elements from a band of fibrous material | [2005/31] | French: | Poinconnage d'éléments annulaires dans une bande de matériau fibreux | [2005/31] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02764964.9 / EP1407183 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.08.2006 | EE | 16.08.2006 | SK | 16.08.2006 | BG | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | [2009/41] |
Former [2008/38] | EE | 16.08.2006 | |
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | SK | 16.08.2006 | |
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | SK | 16.08.2006 | |
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/44] | IT | 16.08.2006 | |
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | SK | 16.08.2006 | |
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | BG | 16.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3329051 (DERWIN LOUIS A) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US3648555 (SCHRAUD ALFRED W, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE4417110 (DOERFLEIN HANS WILLI [DE]) [A] 1-10* abstract * |