EP1587173 - Apparatus for electrically connecting a power delivery device with a power consumption device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magcode AG Aalener Strasse 30 89520 Heidenheim / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neidlein, Hermann Königsbronner Strasse 27 89555 Steinheim / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen, Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007937.5 | 12.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | DE20041019251 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004019251 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587173 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587173 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/22, H01R13/71 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/22 (EP);
H01R13/71 (EP);
H01R13/7037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur elektrischen Verbindung einer Stromgebereinrichtung mit einer Stromabnehmereinrichtung | [2005/42] | English: | Apparatus for electrically connecting a power delivery device with a power consumption device | [2005/42] | French: | Dispositif pour la connexion électrique d'un dispositif d'alimentation électrique à un dispositif de consommation électrique | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | IE | 14.03.2007 | LT | 14.03.2007 | NL | 14.03.2007 | PL | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | AT | 12.04.2007 | LU | 12.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | ES | 25.06.2007 | IS | 14.07.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
LU | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
HU | 15.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
LT | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH505453 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1* column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10048660 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, paragraphs 19,20; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003216073 (YEH RYAN [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 27-29; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE10242664 (MAGCODE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 36 - page 4, paragraph 42; figures 1-8 * |